|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/08/1948 | 18/09/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9696 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61015 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1949 | 05/03/1949 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/03/1950 | 26/04/1950 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1950 | 24/11/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28113 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1952 | 14/01/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28114 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/07/1954 | 26/07/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1954 | 12/01/1955 | 33 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1956 | 27/11/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28137 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1959 | 28/05/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28128 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1959 | 18/06/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/01/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1015, name: DUIKER Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1995 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
21/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9696 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61015 |
||
08/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/02/1949. Dep: 05/03/1949. | ||
27/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/03/1950. Dep: 26/04/1950. | ||
30/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1950. Dep: 24/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28113 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1952. Dep: 14/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28114 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) | ||
21/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
21/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
19/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1954. Dep: 26/07/1954. | ||
11/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1954. Dep: 12/01/1955. | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
30/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1956. Dep: 27/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28137 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
27/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1959. Dep: 28/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28128 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
05/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1959. Dep: 18/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
19/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61015 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |