|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1947 | 10/05/1947 | 13 days | Unclassified | Electric lighting fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1948 | 08/05/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 5075 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61010 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1950 | 07/07/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/07/1950 | 14/07/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1951 | 01/08/1951 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1952 | 21/03/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28404 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1952 | 27/11/1952 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1954 | 06/03/1954 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28235 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1955 | 15/10/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28260 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1955 | 18/10/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1956 | 16/01/1957 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1957 | 31/07/1957 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28369 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1957 | 13/08/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1959 | 03/10/1959 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28874 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1962 | 29/08/1962 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 28302 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1962 | 02/10/1962 | 13 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/05/1951 | \"B1\" excursion | On 29th May, about 1 p.m., BI No. 61010 (without nameplate) was seen with a train of E.R. stock, including kitchen cars, between Earlestown and Winwick Jo. travelling towards Warrington. It had come from the Newton-le-Willows direction and was possibly a through excursion from the N.E.R. to N. Wales. | SLS/195107 |
28/02/1954 | Darlington Works | North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. | SLS/195404 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Sidings) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/11/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1010, name: WILDEBEESTE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1990 Allocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
28/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947. Work undertaken: Electric lighting fitted |
||
17/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1948. Dep: 08/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5075 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61010 |
||
12/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1950. Dep: 07/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3684 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1950. Dep: 14/07/1950. | ||
30/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1951. Dep: 01/08/1951. | ||
26/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1952. Dep: 21/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28404 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1952. Dep: 27/11/1952. | ||
11/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28235 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28260 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1955. Dep: 18/10/1955. | ||
20/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1956. Dep: 16/01/1957. | ||
14/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1957. Dep: 31/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28369 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1957. Dep: 13/08/1957. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
08/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1959. Dep: 03/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28874 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
05/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1962. Dep: 29/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28302 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1962. Dep: 02/10/1962. | ||
07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61010 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
28/02/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |