|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 20/03/1944 | 21/03/1944 | 2 days | Light Repair | Front end heater connection fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 04/06/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 90 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 12/09/1945 | 18/09/1945 | 7 days | Special | Repainted for Royal Train duty |
||
Stratford Works | 14/12/1945 | 19/12/1945 | 6 days | Special | Repainted for Royal Train duty |
||
Stratford Works | 27/05/1946 | 11/06/1946 | 16 days | Unclassified | Repainted for Royal Train duty |
||
Stratford Works | 09/12/1946 | 18/02/1947 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/10/1948 | 18/12/1948 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 9735 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61003 |
||
Stratford Works | 24/01/1950 | 28/01/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 26/01/1951 | 03/03/1951 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 16/07/1951 | 18/08/1951 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28560 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 07/04/1953 | 24/04/1953 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 24/11/1953 | 24/12/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 10812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 25/04/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 15/10/1956 | 01/12/1956 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28510 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/02/1957 | 22/02/1957 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 12/1958 | 30/01/1959 | General | Boiler number 28808 (Diagram 100A) |
|||
Stratford Works | 04/03/1959 | 25/03/1959 | 22 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1960 | 09/07/1960 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1961 | 07/11/1961 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28201 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/11/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 8304, name: GAZELLE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1920 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
09/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
20/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1944. Dep: 21/03/1944. Work undertaken: Front end heater connection fitted |
||
25/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
13/07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
04/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. | ||
12/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Special) - Arr: 12/09/1945. Dep: 18/09/1945. Work undertaken: Repainted for Royal Train duty |
||
28/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
14/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Special) - Arr: 14/12/1945. Dep: 19/12/1945. Work undertaken: Repainted for Royal Train duty |
||
28/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1003 | ||
27/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1946. Dep: 11/06/1946. Work undertaken: Repainted for Royal Train duty |
||
24/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
09/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1946. Dep: 18/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
08/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
13/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1948. Dep: 18/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9735 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61003 |
||
24/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1950. Dep: 28/01/1950. | ||
26/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/01/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951. | ||
16/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1951. Dep: 18/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28560 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 24/04/1953. | ||
24/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1953. Dep: 24/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10812 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. | ||
15/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28510 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1957. Dep: 22/02/1957. | ||
02/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
13/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: ?/12/1958. Dep: 30/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28808 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1959. Dep: 25/03/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
15/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
04/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1960. Dep: 09/07/1960. | ||
06/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1961. Dep: 07/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28201 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
26/09/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
26/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61003 from Colwick (40E) | ||
02/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield |