|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/10/1943 | 12/11/1943 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1944 | 11/02/1944 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1945 | 12/07/1945 | 31 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/07/1946 | 29/08/1946 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/11/1946 | 10/01/1947 | 44 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/08/1947 | 12/09/1947 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/03/1948 | 10/04/1948 | 37 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61002 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/06/1948 | 01/07/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/10/1948 | 30/10/1948 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/01/1949 | 13/01/1949 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/06/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1949 | 19/10/1949 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1949 | 18/11/1949 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/02/1950 | 25/02/1950 | 24 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28601 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/05/1950 | 26/05/1950 | 19 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/08/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/06/1951 | 09/08/1951 | 42 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1953 | 28/09/1953 | 42 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1954 | 14/07/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28801 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/07/1954 | 20/07/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1956 | 08/08/1956 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 28227 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1958 | 03/10/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28293 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1959 | 17/06/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1961 | 06/05/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28235 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1961 | 26/05/1961 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1964 | 24/12/1964 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28588 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (yard) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
30/11/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. | SLS/195001 |
28/02/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. | SLS/195004 |
20/03/1950 | Thornton MPD | On 20/3 'B.1' No. 61002 was noted without a nameplate on the right-hand side. | SLS/195004 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/09/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 8303, name: IMPALA Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1916 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) |
||
28/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1943. Dep: 12/11/1943. | ||
21/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
09/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1944. Dep: 11/02/1944. | ||
04/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Perth (LNER) (PTH) | ||
12/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1945. Dep: 12/07/1945. | ||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1002 | ||
29/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1946. Dep: 29/08/1946. | ||
28/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1946. Dep: 10/01/1947. | ||
27/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/08/1947. Dep: 12/09/1947. | ||
05/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61002 |
||
17/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/06/1948. Dep: 01/07/1948. | ||
13/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/10/1948. Dep: 30/10/1948. | ||
10/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1949. Dep: 13/01/1949. | ||
03/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/06/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. | ||
14/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/09/1949. Dep: 19/10/1949. | ||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 18/11/1949. | ||
02/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1950. Dep: 25/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28601 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
08/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1950. Dep: 26/05/1950. | ||
23/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. | ||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
29/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/06/1951. Dep: 09/08/1951. | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
11/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
17/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
18/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1953. Dep: 28/09/1953. | ||
04/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/03/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. | ||
18/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1954. Dep: 14/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28801 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/07/1954. Dep: 20/07/1954. | ||
21/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1956. Dep: 08/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28227 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1958. Dep: 03/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28293 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1959. Dep: 17/06/1959. | ||
10/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28235 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/05/1961. Dep: 26/05/1961. | ||
19/11/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1964. Dep: 24/12/1964. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28588 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61002 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
08/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield |