|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 08/08/1945 | 07/09/1945 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 15/02/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 58 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1000 |
||
Stratford Works | 24/05/1946 | 15/06/1946 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 28/10/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1947 | 06/09/1947 | 12 days | Special | Repainting |
||
Stratford Works | 19/04/1948 | 29/05/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9439 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61000 |
||
Stratford Works | 20/09/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 03/04/1950 | 27/05/1950 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 28561 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 19/06/1951 | 29/06/1951 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 27/08/1951 | 13/09/1951 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 28/01/1952 | 02/02/1952 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 19/05/1952 | 03/07/1952 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28503 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/07/1953 | 31/07/1953 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 27/09/1954 | 30/10/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28502 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/11/1955 | 10/01/1956 | 56 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 22/10/1956 | 24/11/1956 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 25/06/1957 | 06/09/1957 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 28870 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/10/1959 | 11/12/1959 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28592 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1960 | 14/09/1960 | 2 days | No repairs | Sent to works in error |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1960 | 06/01/1961 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1962 | 26/02/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/01/1943 | New \"Antelope\" Class | The new 'Antelope' Class 4-6-0 8301 Springbok was on view at Liverpool Street on 7th January, and we hope to give full details when available. The boiler is as fitted to the 'B.17' ' class, but works at a higher pressure. The 6' 2' coupled wheels are as used for the 'Green Arrow' mixed traffic engines, and the 20' cyls. with 26' stroke are from the 'K.2' pattern but with steam passages and distribution modified in accordance with recent experience. Except for wheel centres, buffer sockets and the horns, all parts normally supplied in cast steel have been fabricated in the L.N.E.R. workshops. The tender is standard, holding 4200 gallons of water and 71 tons of coal. Weight of engine and tender, in working order, 123 tons 3 cwt. The tractive effort is 268781b., and Springbok, No. 8301, ranks as one of the most powerful mixed traffic locomotives in use on the L.N.E.R. | SLS/194302 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/12/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 8301, name: SPRINGBOK Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1902 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
01/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
08/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1945. Dep: 07/09/1945. | ||
29/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
15/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1000 |
||
24/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946. | ||
21/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
19/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
28/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. | ||
26/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 26/08/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947. Work undertaken: Repainting |
||
01/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
07/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
19/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1948. Dep: 29/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9439 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61000 |
||
20/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. | ||
03/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1950. Dep: 27/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28561 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1951. Dep: 29/06/1951. | ||
27/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1951. Dep: 13/09/1951. | ||
28/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952. | ||
19/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1952. Dep: 03/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28503 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1953. Dep: 31/07/1953. | ||
27/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28502 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1955. Dep: 10/01/1956. | ||
22/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1956. Dep: 24/11/1956. | ||
06/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
25/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1957. Dep: 06/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28870 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1959. Dep: 11/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28592 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
20/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
13/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/09/1960. Dep: 14/09/1960. Work undertaken: Sent to works in error |
||
20/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1960. Dep: 06/01/1961. | ||
26/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/02/1962. Dep: 26/02/1962. | ||
03/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
05/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61000 from Colwick (40E) |