|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1947 | 12/02/1948 | 65 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E522 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1949 | 29/09/1949 | 50 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. Renumbered to BR 60522 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1950 | 18/01/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1951 | 22/11/1951 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1952 | 18/09/1952 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29778 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1954 | 09/06/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29788 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1955 | 30/06/1955 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1956 | 15/03/1956 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1956 | 30/11/1956 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 3 days | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1958 | 14/03/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29854 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1960 | 10/03/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29829 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1960 | 27/08/1960 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1961 | 18/02/1961 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1962 | 14/06/1962 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29804 (Diagram 118) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1964 | 21/10/1964 | 49 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 |
31/03/1963 | Settle-Carlisle diversions (Stored) | Settle-Carlisle trains have been running via Ingleton during March in the daytime; single line operation at Dent during the night. The 'Waverley' is expected to be resumed between Leeds and Edinburgh in April. | SLS/196304 |
30/03/1963 | Forfar MPD (Stored) | On shed at Forfar on0th March, 1963: In steam 45473 (pilot), 44796/97, 44879, 45475, Stored 60522, 73107, 44257 (now cut up), 54486/89/93, 54500, 55263, 56347. | SLS/196304 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard) | New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/06/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 522, name: STRAIGHT DEAL Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2013 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 117 boiler fitted |
||
16/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/12/1947. Dep: 12/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E522 |
||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
11/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1949. Dep: 29/09/1949. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. Renumbered to BR 60522 |
||
19/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/12/1950. Dep: 18/01/1951. | ||
25/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1951. Dep: 22/11/1951. | ||
11/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1952. Dep: 18/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29778 (Diagram 117) |
||
04/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1954. Dep: 09/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29788 (Diagram 117) |
||
09/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/06/1955. Dep: 30/06/1955. | ||
07/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1956. Dep: 15/03/1956. | ||
26/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1956. Dep: 30/11/1956. | ||
24/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 24/10/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. | ||
13/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1958. Dep: 14/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29854 (Diagram 118) |
||
02/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1960. Dep: 10/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29829 (Diagram 118) |
||
30/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1960. Dep: 27/08/1960. | ||
28/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/01/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961. | ||
01/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1962. Dep: 14/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29804 (Diagram 118) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
31/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
15/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
03/09/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1964. Dep: 21/10/1964. | ||
19/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60522 from Polmadie (66A) |