|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1921 | 07/08/1921 | General | Boiler number G930 (Diagram 55Sat) |
|||
Gateshead Works | 07/09/1925 | 16/01/1926 | 132 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1930 | 12/04/1930 | 53 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2204 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1936 | 09/06/1936 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1936 | 14/01/1937 | 58 days | General | Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1937 | 21/05/1937 | 44 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1940 | 30/08/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2382 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1943 | 19/04/1943 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2380 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1945 | 26/01/1946 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2204 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1948 | 16/04/1948 | 50 days | General | Rebuilt to Part 1 Boiler number 3863 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69786 |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1951 | 02/03/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24693 (Diagram 63C) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1953 | 18/07/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24746 (Diagram 63BSup) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1191 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: 07/08/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number G930 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
07/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1925. Dep: 16/01/1926. | ||
19/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2204 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
11/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1936. Dep: 09/06/1936. | ||
18/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1936. Dep: 14/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
08/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/04/1937. Dep: 21/05/1937. | ||
27/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
27/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
10/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
01/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1940. Dep: 30/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2382 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
18/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1943. Dep: 19/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2380 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
19/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1945. Dep: 26/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2204 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9786 | ||
27/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1948. Dep: 16/04/1948. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to Part 1 Boiler number 3863 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69786 |
||
31/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1951. Dep: 02/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24693 (Diagram 63C) |
||
17/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1953. Dep: 18/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24746 (Diagram 63BSup) |
||
25/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
16/12/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69786 from Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
04/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |