|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1920 | 04/1920 | General | Boiler number G939 (Diagram 55Sat) |
|||
Darlington Works | 1922 | 05/1922 | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G927 (Diagram 55Sat) Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1924 | 28/06/1924 | 79 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1925 | 19/11/1925 | 81 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1927 | 31/01/1928 | 92 days | General | Boiler number D2048 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1930 | 26/11/1930 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/12/1932 | 01/02/1933 | 42 days | General | In store at Darlington paint shop 1/2/33-21/6/35 Boiler number D611 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1940 | 03/10/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D2049 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1943 | 07/07/1943 | 65 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1946 | 29/06/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2200 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1948 | 02/07/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2492 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR 69770 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1950 | 08/07/1950 | 32 days | General | Rebuilt to Part 1 Boiler number 3364 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1950 | 17/08/1950 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1952 | 09/05/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24732 (Diagram 63B) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1954 | York Area | October Two further representatives of Class B17 visited York in October, after visits to Doncaster Works, namely 61670 (32D) on 6/10/54 and 61659 (32A) on 28/10/54. Further unusual visitors on 6/10/54 were 45038 (5B) and Stanier 2-6-0 42956 (5B). On 11/10/54 69770 (53A) passed through York for Darlington Works. On 16/10/54 61223 (31A) 'worked an Up freight train, and 68429 (J77) passed through light after a period in store at Selby en route for several weeks' loan to Sunderland. On 19/10/54 73053 (20A) failed at York when working the 8.46 a.m. from Bradford (Forster Square) to Scarborough and was replaced by 61016 (50A). A few days later 73066 (20A) commenced appearances on this turn; this engine has tender 1005/54 of B.R. Series 1C. 69771 (53A) passed through York on 2/11/54 en route for scrapping at Darlington; the rate of withdrawal of this class is being accelerated and 69780 (53C) has also been withdrawn from service in November. 67772 (34E), ex-Darlington Works, passed through York on 2/11/54 returning to Neasden, and on 17/11/54 67740 (34E) appeared in similar circumstances. 63856 (54B) was in York shed yard with motion disconnected, etc., on 30/11/54, en route for Gorton Works; this is one of the locomotives fitted with the additional pumps on the right hand side of the boiler in connection with the Tyne Dock-Consett iron ore trains. 73053 (20A) became divided between the engine and tender at about 10 a.m. on 19/11/54 while running at speed with the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City to Scarborough, necessitating the train being drawn back to Church Fenton where it was re-engined and went forward at 11.5 a.m. 73053 was later removed to York shed for repair where it remained for some days. |
SLS/195412 |
31/10/1954 | Darlington Works | Darlington Works have completed Class '2' B.R. engines up to No. 78039 and withdrawal of old N.E.R. types has speeded up recently. Nos. 69770, 69385, 68258, 68292 (this engine had the extra hanging buffers for shunting the old cauldron wagons long since gone), 68304, 65661/7/86/705/10, and 62358/71/4/80/89. 62371 is of note as she is one of the 1942 rebuilt class''D20' engines, and also, in her early N.E. days as No. 592 she was stationed at Edinburgh, for working the East Coast trains to Newcastle, with Driver John Graham, who was later promoted to Night Running Foreman at Bank Top, Darlington. One thing peculiar to this engine was the absence of brass beading on the splasher above the rear driving wheels, which gave her an odd look. | SLS/195412 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1910 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1113 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/04/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number G939 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/05/1922. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G927 (Diagram 55Sat) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
11/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924. | ||
31/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1925. Dep: 19/11/1925. | ||
01/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1927. Dep: 31/01/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2048 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
06/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1930. Dep: 26/11/1930. | ||
22/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1932. Dep: 01/02/1933. Work undertaken: In store at Darlington paint shop 1/2/33-21/6/35 Boiler number D611 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
22/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
29/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1940. Dep: 03/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2049 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
04/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1943. Dep: 07/07/1943. | ||
22/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9770 | ||
01/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2200 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
02/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1948. Dep: 02/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2492 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR 69770 |
||
07/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1950. Dep: 08/07/1950. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to Part 1 Boiler number 3364 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
||
26/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/07/1950. Dep: 17/08/1950. | ||
17/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1952. Dep: 09/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24732 (Diagram 63B) |
||
10/1954 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
13/10/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69770 from Hull Dairycoates (53A) |