|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 01/07/1926 | 08/07/1926 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/08/1926 | 02/09/1926 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/04/1928 | 14/06/1928 | 73 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1931 | 03/03/1931 | 50 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/10/1931 | 16/12/1931 | 62 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1933 | 31/03/1933 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 3623 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1935 | 23/04/1935 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 3624 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1937 | 11/05/1937 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3623 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1937 | 30/07/1937 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1937 | 23/12/1937 | 102 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1939 | 09/02/1939 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1939 | 19/09/1939 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1940 | 26/04/1940 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1941 | 13/02/1941 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1941 | 15/05/1941 | 21 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1942 | 03/03/1942 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1942 | 23/06/1942 | 67 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1944 | 23/09/1944 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3626 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1945 | 17/01/1946 | 64 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1946 | 01/02/1947 | 74 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1947 | 09/05/1947 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1948 | 20/02/1948 | 11 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9838 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1949 | 03/03/1949 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69838 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1950 | 30/06/1950 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1950 | 25/08/1950 | 3 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1950 | 20/01/1951 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 22361 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1951 | 24/01/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1952 | 06/09/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 22352 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1952 | 09/09/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1952 | 04/12/1952 | 45 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1954 | 30/10/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22377 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1958 | 31/01/1958 | 23 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
22/08/1954 | York MPD | On Sunday 22/8/54 engines staged at York shed for works were as follows:-69838 (51R) for Gorton, 62058 (51G) for Doncaster, 42085 (51A) for Crewe, and also 67786 (34E) returning from Darlington. During the week ended 28/8/54 new BR Class 4 2-.6-0 76043 worked several freight turns between Doncaster and York. On 25/8/54 new BR Class 3 2-.6-4) 77016 passed through York en route from Swindon to the Scottish Region. R.A.S. | SLS/195410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/12/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1768 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3624 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
14/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
01/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/07/1926. Dep: 08/07/1926. | ||
26/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1926. Dep: 02/09/1926. | ||
03/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1928. Dep: 14/06/1928. | ||
27/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
26/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
13/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1931. Dep: 03/03/1931. | ||
16/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1931. Dep: 16/12/1931. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
15/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1933. Dep: 31/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3623 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
26/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1935. Dep: 23/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3624 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1937. Dep: 11/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3623 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/07/1937. Dep: 30/07/1937. | ||
13/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/09/1937. Dep: 23/12/1937. | ||
09/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 09/02/1939. Dep: 09/02/1939. | ||
20/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
13/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1939. Dep: 19/09/1939. | ||
18/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1940. Dep: 26/04/1940. | ||
13/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 13/02/1941. Dep: 13/02/1941. | ||
25/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1941. Dep: 15/05/1941. | ||
02/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1942. Dep: 03/03/1942. | ||
18/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1942. Dep: 23/06/1942. | ||
18/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3626 (Diagram 18) |
||
15/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1945. Dep: 17/01/1946. | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9838 | ||
20/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1946. Dep: 01/02/1947. | ||
22/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/04/1947. Dep: 09/05/1947. | ||
10/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1948. Dep: 20/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9838 |
||
26/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1949. Dep: 03/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69838 |
||
29/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/06/1950. Dep: 30/06/1950. | ||
23/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/08/1950. Dep: 25/08/1950. | ||
12/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1950. Dep: 20/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22361 (Diagram 18) |
||
22/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1951. Dep: 24/01/1951. | ||
15/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
21/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22352 (Diagram 18) |
||
08/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1952. Dep: 09/09/1952. | ||
21/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1952. Dep: 04/12/1952. | ||
18/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22377 (Diagram 18) |
||
19/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
09/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1958. Dep: 31/01/1958. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
05/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69838 from Stockton (51E) |