|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/11/1922 | 03/02/1923 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1341 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1925 | 02/05/1925 | 71 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5372 |
||
Nine Elms Works | 14/08/1926 | 23/08/1926 | 10 days | Light Repair | Converted to oil burnng |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1927 | 16/04/1927 | 71 days | General | Oil burning equipment removed |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1928 | 02/02/1929 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1930 | 07/02/1931 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 986 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1932 | 14/01/1933 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1933 | 11/03/1933 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1934 | 10/11/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1936 | 11/07/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1938 | 26/02/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18) Trip cock gear fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1939 | 15/04/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1941 | 26/07/1941 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1943 | 25/12/1943 | 74 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1944 | 23/12/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1946 | 09/02/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 985 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1948 | 06/03/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9816 |
||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1951 | 02/11/1951 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 22381 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69816 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1953 | 04/12/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22380 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1955 | 27/01/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22369 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1956 | 06/02/1956 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1959 | 16/01/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/07/1917 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 372 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
25/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1922. Dep: 03/02/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1341 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1925. Dep: 02/05/1925. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5372 |
||
14/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Nine Elms Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/08/1926. Dep: 23/08/1926. Work undertaken: Converted to oil burnng |
||
05/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927. Work undertaken: Oil burning equipment removed |
||
01/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1928. Dep: 02/02/1929. | ||
31/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1930. Dep: 07/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 986 (Diagram 18) |
||
26/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 14/01/1933. | ||
04/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/03/1933. Dep: 11/03/1933. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
13/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
29/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1938. Dep: 26/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18) Trip cock gear fitted |
||
18/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1939. Dep: 15/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943. | ||
02/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. | ||
12/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 985 (Diagram 18) |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9816 | ||
07/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1948. Dep: 06/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9816 |
||
11/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
17/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
29/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
04/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
15/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
16/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
29/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
14/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1951. Dep: 02/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22381 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69816 |
||
28/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1953. Dep: 04/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22380 (Diagram 18) |
||
28/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1955. Dep: 27/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22369 (Diagram 18) |
||
02/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1956. Dep: 06/02/1956. | ||
11/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
09/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
16/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 16/01/1959. Dep: 16/01/1959. | ||
19/01/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69816 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
02/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |