|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/04/1920 | 12/06/1920 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1530 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1922 | 04/03/1922 | 57 days | General | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1923 | 13/10/1923 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 169C |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1923 | 17/11/1923 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1926 | 03/04/1926 | 71 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5169 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1927 | 24/12/1927 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1929 | 08/02/1930 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1932 | 14/05/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1933 | 16/09/1933 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1935 | 28/09/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 444 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1937 | 14/08/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 410 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1942 | 13/02/1943 | 96 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1944 | 06/01/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1948 | 03/04/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3869 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69804 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1948 | 08/01/1949 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1949 | 05/01/1950 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 806 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1951 | 22/01/1952 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 22387 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1954 | 05/02/1955 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 22391 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1956 | 02/02/1956 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1957 | 11/10/1957 | 46 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1958 | 31/03/1958 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/05/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 169 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
17/04/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1920. Dep: 12/06/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1530 (Diagram 18) |
||
07/01/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1922. Dep: 04/03/1922. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
28/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1923. Dep: 13/10/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 169C |
||
10/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1923. Dep: 17/11/1923. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
23/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5169 |
||
22/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 08/02/1930. | ||
16/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18) |
||
05/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1933. Dep: 16/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18) |
||
24/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 28/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 444 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
10/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 410 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. | ||
06/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
30/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
08/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18) |
||
10/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943. | ||
25/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18) |
||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9804 | ||
21/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18) |
||
28/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1948. Dep: 03/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3869 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69804 |
||
11/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949. | ||
05/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1949. Dep: 05/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 806 (Diagram 18) |
||
23/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
10/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1951. Dep: 22/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22387 (Diagram 18) |
||
11/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1954. Dep: 05/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22391 (Diagram 18) |
||
20/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
24/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
15/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
23/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
03/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1956. Dep: 02/02/1956. | ||
27/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1957. Dep: 11/10/1957. | ||
31/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/03/1958. Dep: 31/03/1958. | ||
07/04/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69804 from Colwick (38A) | ||
06/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |