|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1938 | 09/09/1938 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1939 | 04/08/1939 | 58 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1941 | 15/03/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1942 | 04/09/1942 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 9023 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1944 | 24/02/1944 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1944 | 30/09/1944 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1945 | 26/01/1946 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1947 | 03/05/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8959 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1949 | 10/06/1949 | 39 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60032 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1951 | 22/03/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29287 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1952 | 16/01/1952 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1952 | 24/10/1952 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29285 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5329 (LNER Corridor) attached. Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1953 | 20/02/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1953 | 22/04/1953 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1954 | 30/03/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29308 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1955 | 21/01/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1955 | 28/10/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29291 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1957 | 15/03/1957 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29325 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5331 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1958 | 27/11/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29285 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1960 | 29/04/1960 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29326 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1960 | 19/10/1960 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1961 | 26/05/1961 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1961 | 29/08/1961 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1962 | 22/03/1962 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29316 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1962 | 11/01/1963 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1963 | 20/09/1963 | 39 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/06/1954 | G.N. notes | With the Summer Service proper, starting on 28th June, interest is again focussed on the 'Elizabethan,' accelerated this year to a 6½-hour schedule. This year it was decided to keep two A4's specially for this job, one to work the train and the other as stand-by. The system previously adopted, of letting the men take their own loco. on this train, has been dropped, presumably because of the extra labour and worry involved in seeing that nine different engines are brought to and maintained in a good enough condition to do the non-stop run just for one week only in each case. Some of the regular engines have got in good mileages (over 80,000 since shopping in one case), and although in an emergency any of them could be relied upon to get through, it is obviously going to be easier to keep two only in good shape. The locos. chosen, both non-regular ones, Nos. 60030 an 60032, are recently ex-works, and the first Down train on Monday 28th was worked by 60030 and the up train by No. 60009 of Haymarket. These two completed the first week without untoward incident, No. 60030 on her first up trip arriving seven minutes early after a journey including at least eight bad P.W. checks. The stand-by engine 60032 has worked a train out and back daily, after seeing the non-stop safely on its way. | SLS/195408 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
21/08/1963 | Doncaster Works (Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. | SLS/196309 |
26/10/1963 | Ex-Haymarket A4\'s | During w/e 26/10, A4s 60006/7/10/17/26/32/4 arrived at St. Margarets from the south. 60006/7 have since moved on to Dalry Rd., 60010 to Ferryhill and 60026/34 to Bathgate for storage. After a few day's work from St. Margarets 60017/32 were to be returned south for scrapping. | SLS/196311 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/05/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4900, name: GANNET Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1874 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
19/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1938. Dep: 09/09/1938. | ||
09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
22/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1939. Dep: 04/08/1939. | ||
01/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941. | ||
22/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1942. Dep: 04/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9023 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
04/09/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
02/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
20/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1944. Dep: 24/02/1944. | ||
12/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. | ||
17/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1945. Dep: 26/01/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 610 but not taken up | ||
26/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 32 | ||
22/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8959 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
03/05/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
03/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1949. Dep: 10/06/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60032 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
19/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1951. Dep: 22/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29287 (Diagram 107) |
||
07/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/01/1952. Dep: 16/01/1952. | ||
16/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29285 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5329 (LNER Corridor) attached. Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
14/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1953. Dep: 20/02/1953. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
07/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 22/04/1953. | ||
01/06/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5675 | ||
24/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1954. Dep: 30/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29308 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
17/06/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5647 | ||
18/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1955. Dep: 21/01/1955. | ||
12/04/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5670 | ||
07/09/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329 | ||
19/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 28/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29291 (Diagram 107) |
||
09/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1957. Dep: 15/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29325 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5331 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
13/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 27/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29285 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
15/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1960. Dep: 29/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29326 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
19/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1960. Dep: 19/10/1960. | ||
01/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/05/1961. Dep: 26/05/1961. | ||
31/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1961. Dep: 29/08/1961. | ||
05/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1962. Dep: 22/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29316 (Diagram 107) |
||
12/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1962. Dep: 11/01/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
13/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/08/1963. Dep: 20/09/1963. | ||
20/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60032 from New England (34E) | ||
06/12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |