|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1938 | 30/06/1938 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1939 | 29/06/1939 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1940 | 29/04/1940 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1942 | 13/02/1942 | 44 days | General | Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1943 | 06/01/1944 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 9030 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender De-named HERRING GULL Named SIR RALPH WEDGWOOD |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1944 | 28/03/1944 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1944 | 30/09/1944 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1947 | 02/04/1947 | 40 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1948 | 02/12/1948 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60006 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1949 | 08/08/1949 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1950 | 31/05/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29296 (Diagram 107) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1950 | 01/11/1950 | 7 days | Light Casual | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1950 | 05/01/1951 | 9 days | Light Casual | Tender number 5647 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1951 | 17/10/1951 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1953 | 24/02/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1953 | 15/05/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1953 | 28/07/1953 | 15 days | Unclassified | Tender number 5647 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1953 | 10/11/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1954 | 28/10/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1955 | 19/01/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29274 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1957 | 25/09/1957 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 293i8 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1957 | 01/01/1958 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1958 | 03/04/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1959 | 12/08/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29320 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1960 | 29/12/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29334 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1961 | 25/08/1961 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1962 | 28/04/1962 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1962 | 10/10/1962 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 27972 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1963 | 28/05/1963 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 22/03/1965 | 27/03/1965 | 6 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1945 | G.N. Section | The rebuilt A.1, 4470, is working regular trial runs from King's Cross shed on day and night expresses to Grantham and back, apparently in comparison with A.4 4466, also recently off Plant, and with the same crews. | SLS/194601 |
11/07/1953 | Kings Cross failures | A sudden spate of failures early in the month put Kings X loco. in a spot; Nos. 60006/7/15/26 were some of the worst casualties, and of these only 60015 has yet returned to traffic. 60010/3/21/30 have also been missing during this period, involving much double-tripping for those left running to the extent of over 500 miles in less than twelve hours in some cases. Other failures include the occasion when Driver Howard (that star of television) had to leave 60007 at Hatfield and bring the Up Tees-Tyne into Kings X behind an N2, complete with headboard. Oh, shame ! The Tees-Tyne suffered again on 29/7/53 when 60033 came off at Hitchin with a hot R. hand driving box; 61097 substituted and the train was 16 mins. late on arrival. On 25/7 60029 on the Up Scotsman came off with a warm trailing pony truck at Hatfield and an N2 again took over. | SLS/195310 |
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Weigh-house) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
26/10/1963 | Ex-Haymarket A4\'s | During w/e 26/10, A4s 60006/7/10/17/26/32/4 arrived at St. Margarets from the south. 60006/7 have since moved on to Dalry Rd., 60010 to Ferryhill and 60026/34 to Bathgate for storage. After a few day's work from St. Margarets 60017/32 were to be returned south for scrapping. | SLS/196311 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/01/1938 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5670 | ||
26/01/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4466, name: HERRING GULL Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1868 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
30/04/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
18/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/06/1938. Dep: 30/06/1938. | ||
19/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. | ||
28/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1939. Dep: 29/06/1939. | ||
04/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1940. Dep: 29/04/1940. | ||
01/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1942. Dep: 13/02/1942. Work undertaken: Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
01/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1943. Dep: 06/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9030 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender De-named HERRING GULL Named SIR RALPH WEDGWOOD |
||
06/01/1944 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
16/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1944. Dep: 28/03/1944. | ||
13/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
11/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. | ||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. | ||
26/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 605 | ||
27/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6 | ||
22/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1947. Dep: 02/04/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
02/04/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
21/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1948. Dep: 02/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60006 |
||
13/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1949. Dep: 08/08/1949. | ||
18/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1950. Dep: 31/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29296 (Diagram 107) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
26/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1950. Dep: 01/11/1950. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
28/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/12/1950. Dep: 05/01/1951. Work undertaken: Tender number 5647 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
05/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1951. Dep: 17/10/1951. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
17/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1953. Dep: 24/02/1953. | ||
14/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1953. Dep: 15/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
24/06/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5328 | ||
14/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1953. Dep: 28/07/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 5647 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
10/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1953. Dep: 10/11/1953. | ||
17/06/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5675 | ||
22/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1954. Dep: 28/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107) |
||
07/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1955. Dep: 19/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29274 (Diagram 107) |
||
12/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 25/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 293i8 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
12/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1957. Dep: 01/01/1958. | ||
27/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1958. Dep: 03/04/1958. | ||
07/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1959. Dep: 12/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29320 (Diagram 107) |
||
15/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1960. Dep: 29/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29334 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
03/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/08/1961. Dep: 25/08/1961. | ||
10/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1962. Dep: 28/04/1962. | ||
07/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1962. Dep: 10/10/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27972 (Diagram 107) |
||
23/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/04/1963. Dep: 28/05/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
20/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
04/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
22/03/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1965. Dep: 27/03/1965. | ||
03/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60006 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
10/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |