|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1938 | 25/02/1938 | 7 days | Unclassified | Larger coal space provided |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1938 | 16/01/1939 | 48 days | General | New numbers & letters in cut-out stainless steel |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1940 | 20/04/1940 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1942 | 21/02/1942 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 8946 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1943 | 20/10/1943 | 38 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1945 | 04/05/1945 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1947 | 06/03/1947 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 9489 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 7 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1947 | 15/10/1947 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1948 | 24/03/1948 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60007 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1948 | 08/10/1948 | 47 days | General | For Rugby testing station opening |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1948 | 09/11/1948 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1950 | 27/09/1950 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 29271 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1952 | 17/04/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1952 | 21/05/1952 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1952 | 21/11/1952 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1953 | 17/02/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1953 | 19/10/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1955 | 12/03/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1956 | 13/04/1956 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1957 | 13/12/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29324 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1957 | 18/12/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1959 | 16/04/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29331 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1960 | 07/10/1960 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27970 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1961 | 13/06/1961 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1961 | 23/12/1961 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1962 | 19/05/1962 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1962 | 25/10/1962 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 27966 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1963 | 21/06/1963 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 17/12/1964 | 18/12/1964 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 30/03/1965 | 01/04/1965 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 10/05/1965 | 11/05/1965 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
30/04/1948 | General | Amongst locomotives carrying cast smokebox numberplates, the following have been noted: Nos. 60007/33/54, 60107, 60511 an 60866. | SLS/194806 |
01/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives under repair here on 1/10 included Nos. 8, 37, 87, 98, 516/19, 1092, 1107/09/12/24, 60007/18/19/20/60, 60635 an 61120. | SLS/194811 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
14/06/1952 | \"Capitals\" A.4\'s | During the first week of the Summer service the 'Capitals' was worked by No. 60017 from the Kings X end and No. 60027 from Edinburgh. This year it had been arranged that the Kings X men should work this train with their own engines; an idea about which the men, at least, were enthusiasts There seemed every chance that the scheme might work too as the regular engines have been maintained in fine condition of late, failures on the road with one being virtually unknown. However, the second week when 60007 should have been the engine, 60033 was sent instead as the former was giving some anxiety over the amount of oil it was using. 60033 also did its own turn the following week. 60028 an 60010 should have worked the fourth and fifth weeks respectively but 60017 did both weeks. No. 60017 is, in fact, spare at the moment as its two regular drivers (Messrs. Burgess and Smith) have taken over 60022, recently out of works and painted green. No. 60027 from the Edinburgh end has worked the train (and its equivalent Sunday working) daily without a break for the five weeks mentioned above, and so far shows no signs of ceasing to do so. All the drivers who have handled it say it is in superb condition. | SLS/195209 |
26/07/1952 | Speed Trials | In addition to the speed trials previously recorded, two further sets of trials have been carried out between London (K. X) and Doncaster and Leeds, with trains of between 250 and 500 Tons at various schedules. The first series, during week ended 26/7/52, were run by No. 60056, Driver E. Hailstone again being on the footplate. Apart from the Monday when the trial ended ignominiously at Knebworth with injector trouble, several notable runs were made. On the Tuesday, Leeds (186 miles) was reached in 178 minutes with a train of 365 tons, and on this occasion Doncaster was passed (156 miles in 144 minutes; speeds in excess of 90 m.p.h. being attained several times during this run. For the series as a whole the limit on many parts of the track was lifted to 90, by the engineers. On Wednesday No. 60056 with 450 Tons did the 156 miles from Doncaster in 143 minutes. The second series run during week ended 6/9/52 began on the Monday with Driver Burgess and his own engine No. 60022, not long out of works after general overhaul. However, Mallard ran hot near Corby on the first Down train, and that run was abandoned. On the Tuesday, No. 60056 was 10 minutes late on the return journey, on a schedule of 139 minutes from Doncaster. On Wednesday No. 60007 kept time with 300 Tons, being allowed 143 minutes Down and 144 Up; the next day No. 60056 again with 250 Tons, kept to the schedule of 139 minutes Down and Up. Altogether these trials are very encouraging from the point of view of the Railway enthusiast, and lead one to hope that the rumours of a possible re-introduction of high-speed trains during Coronation year will indeed prove correct. If so, there appear to be good grounds for confidence in the locomotives and crews to play their part in an enthusiastic attempt to restore to British Railways the leading place they once held in the world. | SLS/195211 |
11/07/1953 | Kings Cross failures | A sudden spate of failures early in the month put Kings X loco. in a spot; Nos. 60006/7/15/26 were some of the worst casualties, and of these only 60015 has yet returned to traffic. 60010/3/21/30 have also been missing during this period, involving much double-tripping for those left running to the extent of over 500 miles in less than twelve hours in some cases. Other failures include the occasion when Driver Howard (that star of television) had to leave 60007 at Hatfield and bring the Up Tees-Tyne into Kings X behind an N2, complete with headboard. Oh, shame ! The Tees-Tyne suffered again on 29/7/53 when 60033 came off at Hitchin with a hot R. hand driving box; 61097 substituted and the train was 16 mins. late on arrival. On 25/7 60029 on the Up Scotsman came off with a warm trailing pony truck at Hatfield and an N2 again took over. | SLS/195310 |
20/03/1954 | York Excursions | On 20/3/54 three excursion trains were run from York to Warrington for an important Rugby League match, the first train travelling via Leeds and the following two via Normanton; they were hauled respectively by 61224, 61084 an 61176 (all 50A). On 27/3/54 61224 (50A) worked the York portion of a North Eastern Region special dining excursion for the Grand National at Aintree, leaving York at 8.45 a.m. On 28/4/54 43133 (65A) was noted at York about 2.30 p.m. working a train of empties from Hull to Heaton. 60007 (34A) failed at Thirsk on 23/4/54 whilst working the Up Tees-Tyne Pullman, 9.25 a.m. Newcastle to King's Cross. It was replaced by 60981, the York south end pilot, which ran out light to Thirsk with the minimum of delay. In the evening 60007 was hauled into York shed by 61035 (50B). |
SLS/195406 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
26/10/1963 | Ex-Haymarket A4\'s | During w/e 26/10, A4s 60006/7/10/17/26/32/4 arrived at St. Margarets from the south. 60006/7 have since moved on to Dalry Rd., 60010 to Ferryhill and 60026/34 to Bathgate for storage. After a few day's work from St. Margarets 60017/32 were to be returned south for scrapping. | SLS/196311 |
24/07/1966 | Crewe Works (Side of works) | Erecting Shop: 45041/187/203/54/312, 48076/151/356/465/622, 75029, 92069/154, D223/35/56/87/91, D360, D1563/4/89/94, D1612/82/90, D1724/51/9/72, D5717, D8026/49, D1102-9. Electric shop: E3033/8/42/3/89, 26037; Adjoining Electric shop: D1500/14/8/687/715/60/813/58/88, D244, D297, D5252/7, D7584/5, 27000. Paint shop area: D200, D277, D342, D1101, D1716, D1841, D5709. Traverser area: 26009, 27005, D333, D1510/78/632/50/70/743/8/851/79/906/9, D5714, E3011/44/86. Test area: D397, D1542/59/82/95/710/7, D5275. Old C shop: E3016/45/67/173, D5102/3, D5704. Side of works: D386, D1581, D1853, D5710, 44779, 60007 for restoration, 70051, 71000, 75062. | SLS/196609 |
11/09/1966 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 44658, 44680, 44807, 44839/64, 45134/449, 60007, 70039, 73069, 90318/65, 92234, E3004/35/9/45, D216/8/46, D328, D368, D370/4, D391, D1104-11, D1583/8, D1600/8/10/3/86, D1762/76, D1865; Electric Shop: E3018/38/44/54, 26055; Adjacent to Electric Shop: D204/37, D311, D1515/20/46, D1663/80, D1761, D1858/9/81, D1915, D5105, D5107/11, D5711/4, 27005; Test Area: D222/3/74, D336/43, D1501, D1688, D1727/69/96, D5246, D5717, D8049; Traverser Area: D217, D322, D1503, D1627/53/67/72, D1764, D1876, D1904, D8000/7, 26017, 70052, 71000. At side of Works: 45131/8, 70006/17, 90265/396, D1604, D1782, D1812, D5710. Paint Shop: D367, D1103, D5709, E3008, 44776, 44800, 60010, 26037. | SLS/196610 |
11/12/1966 | Crewe Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. | SLS/196701 |
08/01/1967 | Crewe Works (Erecting shop) | Erecting shop-60007/10, 70013, 92220, D293, D388, D1505/7/23/92, D1622/30, D1728/56/74/81/91/7/8, D1805/37, D5711, D8005/43, E3001/2/14/6/22/3/6/9/45/6/68, E3100/99, E5023, E5015(E6101), E5016 (E6102), E5006(E6103). Old Paint shop-D249, D1102/9/10/1/5/94, D5709, D8061, E3064, E5019, 92009. Side of Works-D5710/3, 90243/81. Traverser area-D233, D1525, D1619, D1751, D1977, D5715, D8017, 60026, 71000. New shop-D251, D284, D332, D346, D364, D366, D1513/68/79, D1617, D1750, D1925/43. Electric shop-E3171, E26050. New Paint shop: D1621/9, D1758/77. No sign of E5024-the conversions appear to be having completely new bodies apart from cabs and are somewhat lengthened in appearance. | SLS/196702 |
19/02/1967 | Crewe Works (New paint shop) | Erecting shop-D1506/9/17, D1605/26/33/98, D1744/54/65/70/94/9, D1802, E3002/13/26/45/6/68/70/1, E3131/52/63/99, D213/81/2, D382, D8054, E5003, E6101/2/3/4/5, E26018/25. Traverser Area-D1501/5/12/5/88, 60026, 71000, E3025/79, D385, D8003. New shop-D390, D1514/8/9/73/89, D1635/94, D1736/53/9, D1851, D1948, D8123/38 (damaged). New paint shop-60007/10, 92220. Old paint shop area-90243/81, E26033, D378, D1596, D1852, D8048, E3016/105. | SLS/196704 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/10/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4498, name: SIR NIGEL GRESLEY Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1863 Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
30/11/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
19/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/02/1938. Dep: 25/02/1938. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided |
||
05/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. | ||
30/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1938. Dep: 16/01/1939. Work undertaken: New numbers & letters in cut-out stainless steel |
||
08/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940. | ||
01/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1942. Dep: 21/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8946 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
08/08/1943 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5324 | ||
13/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1943. Dep: 20/10/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
20/10/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
23/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
17/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 04/05/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 600 but not taken up | ||
12/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1947. Dep: 06/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9489 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 7 |
||
06/03/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
26/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/09/1947. Dep: 15/10/1947. | ||
17/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/03/1948. Dep: 24/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60007 |
||
23/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1948. Dep: 08/10/1948. Work undertaken: For Rugby testing station opening |
||
03/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1948. Dep: 09/11/1948. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
11/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1950. Dep: 27/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29271 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
12/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1952. Dep: 17/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
17/04/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
12/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1952. Dep: 21/05/1952. | ||
04/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 21/11/1952. | ||
13/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1953. Dep: 17/02/1953. | ||
14/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1953. Dep: 19/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
09/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1955. Dep: 12/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
28/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1956. Dep: 13/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107) |
||
12/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1957. Dep: 13/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29324 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
14/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1957. Dep: 18/12/1957. | ||
10/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1959. Dep: 16/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29331 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
25/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1960. Dep: 07/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27970 (Diagram 107) |
||
17/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1961. Dep: 13/06/1961. | ||
27/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/11/1961. Dep: 23/12/1961. | ||
03/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1962. Dep: 19/05/1962. | ||
09/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1962. Dep: 25/10/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27966 (Diagram 107) |
||
28/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1963. Dep: 21/06/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
20/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
20/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
17/12/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/12/1964. Dep: 18/12/1964. | ||
30/03/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1965. Dep: 01/04/1965. | ||
10/05/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1965. Dep: 11/05/1965. | ||
01/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60007 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |