|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1938 | 09/02/1938 | 2 days | Light Repair | Larger coal space provided |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1938 | 18/06/1938 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1939 | 24/06/1939 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1939 | 30/09/1939 | 20 days | Heavy | Boiler number 29293 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1941 | 08/05/1941 | 63 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1942 | 12/09/1942 | 43 days | General | Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 9026 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1944 | 15/12/1944 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1945 | 23/01/1945 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1945 | 10/11/1945 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1946 | 21/05/1946 | 51 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1947 | 09/08/1947 | 46 days | General | Rebuilt to class A4/1 To 75% Cut-off Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1948 | 26/05/1948 | 41 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60012 |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1949 | 24/08/1949 | 44 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1951 | 09/02/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1952 | 21/11/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29286 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1953 | 28/08/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1954 | 25/03/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29274 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 18/10/1954 | 07/11/1954 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1955 | 09/02/1955 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1955 | 03/12/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29270 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1957 | 26/04/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29326 (Diagram 107) |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 07/02/1958 | 10/02/1958 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1958 | 18/07/1958 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29316 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1959 | 12/03/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1959 | 22/11/1959 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27963 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1960 | 28/06/1960 | 42 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1960 | 14/09/1960 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/03/1961 | 03/03/1961 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1961 | 27/10/1961 | 46 days | General | Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1962 | 21/06/1962 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 27/09/1963 | 27/09/1963 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 05/02/1964 | 06/02/1964 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster MPD (36A) (Ex-Works on shed) | Ex-Works on shed: D5818/9 new, 43062, 60012/50/92, 61361, 63922, 62040; also 61444 ex-Darlington Works. | SLS/196112 |
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/06/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4491, name: COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1856 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
08/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/02/1938. Dep: 09/02/1938. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided |
||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. | ||
08/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939. | ||
11/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/09/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29293 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
07/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1941. Dep: 08/05/1941. | ||
01/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942. Work undertaken: Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
21/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9026 (Diagram 107) |
||
25/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1944. Dep: 15/12/1944. | ||
19/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1945. Dep: 23/01/1945. | ||
09/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 593 but not taken up | ||
01/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1946. Dep: 21/05/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
21/05/1946 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
12/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 12 | ||
25/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A4/1 To 75% Cut-off Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
16/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1948. Dep: 26/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60012 |
||
12/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1949. Dep: 24/08/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
10/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 09/02/1951. | ||
21/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1952. Dep: 21/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29286 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
21/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1953. Dep: 28/08/1953. | ||
19/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1954. Dep: 25/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29274 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
18/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 07/11/1954. | ||
26/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/01/1955. Dep: 09/02/1955. | ||
02/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29270 (Diagram 107) |
||
19/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1957. Dep: 26/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29326 (Diagram 107) |
||
07/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/02/1958. Dep: 10/02/1958. | ||
02/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1958. Dep: 18/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29316 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
07/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1959. Dep: 12/03/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
19/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1959. Dep: 22/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27963 (Diagram 107) |
||
18/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/05/1960. Dep: 28/06/1960. | ||
16/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1960. Dep: 14/09/1960. | ||
01/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1961. Dep: 03/03/1961. | ||
12/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 27/10/1961. Work undertaken: Speedometer fitted |
||
16/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1962. Dep: 21/06/1962. | ||
09/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
27/09/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1963. Dep: 27/09/1963. | ||
20/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
05/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1964. Dep: 06/02/1964. | ||
20/08/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60012 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
03/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |