|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/07/1924 | 19/07/1924 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1925 | 30/03/1926 | 148 days | General | New crank axle |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/03/1927 | 25/03/1927 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/11/1927 | 29/11/1927 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/12/1927 | 02/02/1928 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1928 | 07/12/1928 | 88 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1928 | 28/12/1928 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1930 | 02/04/1930 | 65 days | General | New crank axle and bronze axleboxes Boiler number 1447 (Diagram 47) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1931 | 05/01/1932 | 72 days | General | Steam brake |
||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1932 | 03/10/1932 | 46 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1932 | 10/01/1933 | 47 days | Heavy | Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 47) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1934 | 13/08/1934 | 60 days | General | 8 wheel tender Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 47) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1934 | 03/10/1934 | 27 days | Light Repair | Collision damage |
||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1936 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/03/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2402 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1222 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 47 boiler fitted |
||
04/1924 | Naming | Named 'CITY OF YORK' | ||
02/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924. | ||
03/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1925. Dep: 30/03/1926. Work undertaken: New crank axle |
||
10/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/03/1927. Dep: 25/03/1927. | ||
15/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1927. Dep: 29/11/1927. | ||
30/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1927. Dep: 02/02/1928. | ||
11/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1928. Dep: 07/12/1928. | ||
21/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1928. Dep: 28/12/1928. | ||
28/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1930. Dep: 02/04/1930. Work undertaken: New crank axle and bronze axleboxes Boiler number 1447 (Diagram 47) |
||
26/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1931. Dep: 05/01/1932. Work undertaken: Steam brake |
||
19/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1932. Dep: 03/10/1932. | ||
25/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/11/1932. Dep: 10/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 47) |
||
15/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1934. Dep: 13/08/1934. Work undertaken: 8 wheel tender Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 47) |
||
13/08/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
07/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/09/1934. Dep: 03/10/1934. Work undertaken: Collision damage |
||
06/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 06/07/1936. | ||
25/07/1936 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2402 from York (North) (YK) | ||
29/08/1936 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |