Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2304 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20107 Week
» 73123 Month
» 192650 Year
» 3219503 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5860 |
11/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31325 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31464 |
17/02/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
11/10/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/10/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
31/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5860 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 396 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
31/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31325 |
|
|
17/02/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31464 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/01/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31464 |
|
|
10/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|