Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4283 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17689 Week
» 70705 Month
» 190232 Year
» 3217085 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5859 |
04/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31324 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
04/10/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/11/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/10/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
31/12/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5859 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SX) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31324 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
16/04/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31324 |
|
|
05/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|