Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3992 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22903 Week
» 87857 Month
» 290521 Year
» 3317374 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5858 |
20/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31323 |
02/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
20/09/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/11/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
24/06/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/09/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
24/06/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5858 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
24/06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31323 |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
08/06/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31323 |
|
|
09/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|