Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4574 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 30608 Week
» 129253 Month
» 331917 Year
» 3358770 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5857 |
06/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31322 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
06/09/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/09/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
15/06/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/09/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
15/06/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1981 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5857 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/09/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
15/06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31322 |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
28/07/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31322 |
|
|
12/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|