Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2432 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15838 Week
» 68854 Month
» 188381 Year
» 3215234 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5854 |
23/08/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31320 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
23/08/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
08/05/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/08/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/05/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
23/02/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Not known |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5854 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
10/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
08/05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31320 |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
28/04/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31320 |
|
|
03/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Stratford MPD |
|
|