Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1915 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27949 Week
» 126594 Month
» 329258 Year
» 3356111 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5845 |
14/06/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31311 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
24/11/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
24/11/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
16/11/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Not known |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5845 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
28/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
25/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
24/11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31311 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
07/02/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31311 |
|
|
12/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|