Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1325 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14731 Week
» 67747 Month
» 187274 Year
» 3214127 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5843 |
31/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31309 |
18/10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
07/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
04/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
07/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
04/1976 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
04/1982 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5843 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
21/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
18/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31309 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
04/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
04/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
08/04/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31309 |
|
|
04/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|