Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5840 |
10/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31307 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31449 |
30/08/1984 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31549 |
04/10/1990 |
|
TOPS (31/4 (2)) |
31449 |
05/02/2001 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
10/05/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/11/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
19/12/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
19/12/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5840 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
19/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31307 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31449 |
|
|
04/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31549 |
|
|
01/03/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31549 |
|
|
05/02/2001 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31449 |
|
|
02/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|