Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3076 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16482 Week
» 69498 Month
» 189025 Year
» 3215878 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5838 |
26/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31305 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
26/04/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
03/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
11/1983 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/04/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 06/1974 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1982 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1983 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5838 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
11/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31305 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
26/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
03/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/1983 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
08/11/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31305 |
|
|
06/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|