Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 2836 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16242 Week
» 69258 Month
» 188785 Year
» 3215638 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5828 |
28/12/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31295 |
06/12/1973 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31447 |
30/07/1984 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31547 |
31/12/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
28/12/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
05/10/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/10/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
05/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/12/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
05/10/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
05/1976 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/12/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5828 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
15/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
07/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
05/10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
05/10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
06/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31295 |
|
|
27/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
30/07/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31447 |
|
|
31/12/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31547 |
|
|
01/01/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31547 |
|
|
11/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|