Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 578 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6362 Week
» 27751 Month
» 147278 Year
» 3174131 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5814 |
14/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31414 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31514 |
15/10/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
14/09/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/06/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/09/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
01/1972 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
05/1973 |
xei |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, boiler isolated |
WR ATC |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
xei |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, boiler isolated |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 04/1977 |
xei |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, boiler isolated |
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
xei |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, boiler isolated |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5814 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 315 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
03/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
24/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31414 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
15/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31514 |
|
|
01/02/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31514 |
|
|