Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1390 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 6543 Week
» 141359 Month
» 344023 Year
» 3370876 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5811 |
on |
09/08/1933 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
58xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
279 |
To Service |
Mon 09/08/1933 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 27/05/1957 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys |
Total Mileage |
443,593 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
09/08/1933 |
CNYD |
|
Croes Newydd |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Stored |
on |
09/07/1956 |
81F |
|
Oxford (Reinstated) |
on |
06/02/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/05/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
81F |
Oxford |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/08/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5811 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Croes Newydd (CNYD) |
|
|
09/07/1956 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
06/02/1957 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
27/05/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5811 |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|