Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 571 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14614 Week
» 79568 Month
» 282232 Year
» 3309085 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5713 |
07/03/1959 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/01/1960 |
R.9951 |
Vacuum Trip Gear |
|
£67/14/- |
|
£67/14/- |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/03/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
29/12/1959 |
01/01/1960 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
4 days |
|
|
|
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
11/03/1960 |
10/06/1960 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
92 days |
|
|
|
Metropolitan Vickers |
|
n/a |
19/06/1961 |
15/03/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
270 days |
|
|
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1959 |
34,739 |
34,739 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1960 |
6,266 |
41,005 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1961 |
0 |
41,005 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
37,484 |
78,489 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
35,974 |
114,463 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/03/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5713 Built at Metropolitan Vickers Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
29/12/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1959. Dep: 01/01/1960. |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Trip Gear |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
11/03/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1960. Dep: 10/06/1960. |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
19/06/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1961. Dep: 15/03/1962. |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
17/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5713 from Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|