Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3420 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16826 Week
» 69842 Month
» 189369 Year
» 3216222 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5711 |
14/02/1959 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/02/1961 |
5/10899 |
Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
|
£142/12/10 |
£31/7/2 |
£174/-/- |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/02/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
11/04/1959 |
28/04/1959 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
18 days |
|
|
|
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
22/06/1960 |
16/09/1960 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
87 days |
|
|
|
Derby Works |
|
n/a |
11/11/1960 |
03/02/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
85 days |
|
|
|
Metropolitan Vickers |
|
n/a |
23/10/1961 |
07/12/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
411 days |
|
|
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1959 |
37,952 |
37,952 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1960 |
28,129 |
66,081 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1961 |
2,060 |
68,141 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1962 |
1,789 |
69,930 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1963 |
53,522 |
123,452 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/02/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5711 Built at Metropolitan Vickers Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/04/1959. Dep: 28/04/1959. |
|
|
22/06/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1960. Dep: 16/09/1960. |
|
|
11/11/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/11/1960. Dep: 03/02/1961. |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Modification |
Modification: Wrap round windscreens replaced with flat ones. |
|
|
23/10/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Metropolitan Vickers (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/10/1961. Dep: 07/12/1962. |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
17/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
17/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
07/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5711 from Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
10/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|