Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 840 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4206 Week
» 840 Month
» 337686 Year
» 1559251 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5698 m/e 01/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1927
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962
Scrapping During 12/1962
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1927
86J Aberdare 4w/e 03/10/1953
   Withdrawn on 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MTHR Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 25/01/1947
ALLOC CH   4w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC MTHR Merthyr Tydfil m/e 30/04/1948
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5698
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5698    

prev prev