Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1021 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4387 Week
» 1021 Month
» 337867 Year
» 1559432 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5690 m/e 01/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1927
Withdrawal Thu 01/08/1963
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1927
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 06/11/1954
86F Tondu 4w/e 21/05/1960
   Withdrawn on 01/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 86F Tondu 4w/e 21/05/1960
WDN   5w/e 31/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5690
Built at Swindon Works
   
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (86F)    
01/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5690    

prev prev