Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1612 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15018 Week
» 68034 Month
» 187561 Year
» 3214414 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5690 |
09/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31262 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
09/03/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
10/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/11/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
10/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, EQ Brakes |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5690 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 291 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
20/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
05/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31262 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
29/05/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31262 |
|
|
07/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|