Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 917 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4283 Week
» 917 Month
» 337763 Year
» 1559328 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5685 m/e 01/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1927
Withdrawal Fri 14/02/1964
Scrapping During 04/1964
Service Life 37 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1927
86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 23/04/1955
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 22/03/1958
88C Barry 4w/e 03/12/1960
88C Barry 4w/e 12/08/1961
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 09/09/1961
88E Abercynon 4w/e 11/08/1962
   Withdrawn on 14/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 09/09/1961
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 11/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5685
Built at Swindon Works
   
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
14/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5685    

prev prev