Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4283 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17689 Week
» 70705 Month
» 190232 Year
» 3217085 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5684 |
26/01/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31256 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31459 |
14/12/1984 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
26/01/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
06/11/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/01/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/11/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/01/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5684 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 285 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31256 |
|
|
27/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
07/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
14/12/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31459 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|