Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 341 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18144 Week
» 71160 Month
» 190687 Year
» 3217540 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5683 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
235 |
To Service |
During 10/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 10/03/1964 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
17/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
5w/e |
30/03/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5683 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rhymney (RHY) |
|
|
17/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
10/03/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5683 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|