Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 5132 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20744 Week
» 119389 Month
» 322053 Year
» 3348906 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5683 |
19/01/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31255 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
19/01/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/03/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
24/09/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/01/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
24/09/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/01/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5683 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 284 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
15/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
24/09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31255 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
23/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|