Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2487 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15893 Week
» 68909 Month
» 188436 Year
» 3215289 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5682 |
12/01/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31254 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
12/01/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/01/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 04/1977 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
16/11/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/01/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5682 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 283 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
28/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
09/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31254 |
|
|
06/03/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
01/12/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31254 |
|
|
07/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: at Old Oak Common MPD |
|
|