Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2958 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33608 Week
» 132253 Month
» 334917 Year
» 3361770 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5681 |
05/01/1961 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31253 |
26/01/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31431 |
29/11/1983 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31531 |
11/10/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
05/01/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/01/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1974 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 07/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/01/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5681 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 282 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
19/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31253 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
29/11/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31431 |
|
|
11/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31531 |
|
|
01/01/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31531 |
|
|
07/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|