Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2716 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16122 Week
» 69138 Month
» 188665 Year
» 3215518 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5676 |
08/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31248 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
08/12/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 07/1975 |
|
Tablet catcher apparatus removed |
|
|
|
|
by 08/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/12/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
08/07/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5676 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 276 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31248 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Tablet catcher apparatus removed |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
22/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|
31/03/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31248 |
|
|