Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 133 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6440 Week
» 21554 Month
» 324744 Year
» 1546309 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5675 m/e 09/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 09/1926
Withdrawal Sat 26/12/1964
Scrapping During 04/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 38 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1926
87F Llanelly 4w/e 04/10/1952
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 24/01/1953
87F Llanelly 4w/e 21/02/1953
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 05/09/1953
81E Didcot 4w/e 05/11/1955
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 17/05/1958
88A Radyr 4w/e 24/01/1959
87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1959
87F Llanelly 4w/e 29/06/1963
   Withdrawn on 26/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LLY Llanelly m/e 31/05/1948
ALLOC LDR Landore 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC LLY Llanelly 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC LLY Llanelly 4w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 81E Didcot m/e 30/11/1955
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 88A Radyr m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 29/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5675
Built at Swindon Works
   
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
26/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5675    

prev prev