Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 968 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4334 Week
» 968 Month
» 337814 Year
» 1559379 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5673 m/e 08/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 08/1926
Withdrawal Mon 08/03/1965
Scrapping During 05/1965
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1926
87H Neyland 2w/e 12/07/1952
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 04/10/1952
87E Landore 4w/e 01/11/1952
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 17/06/1961
88B Radyr 4w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 08/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 29/09/1963
WDN   5w/e 12/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5673
Built at Swindon Works
   
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
08/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5673    

prev prev