Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3911 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17317 Week
» 70333 Month
» 189860 Year
» 3216713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5664 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
235 |
To Service |
During 02/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 31/08/1962 |
Service Life |
36 yrs , 7 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1926 |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
CV.FDL |
|
Ferndale |
m/e |
31/03/1948 |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
m/e |
30/06/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
31/08/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
FDL |
Ferndale |
m/e |
31/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
BRY |
Barry |
m/e |
30/06/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5664 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
31/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ferndale (CV.FDL) |
|
|
30/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
31/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5664 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|