Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 567 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6351 Week
» 27740 Month
» 147267 Year
» 3174120 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5662 |
27/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31235 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
262 |
To Service |
27/10/1960 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
26/05/2000 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys |
Information |
4-digit route indicators |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
27/10/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
30/11/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
28/05/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/10/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
28/05/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5662 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 262 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
30/11/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
28/05/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31235 |
|
|
26/05/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31235 |
|
|