Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 894 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4260 Week
» 894 Month
» 337740 Year
» 1559305 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5657 m/e 02/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 02/1926
Withdrawal Fri 27/07/1962
Scrapping During 10/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 36 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1926
87H Neyland 6w/e 30/06/1952
84B Oxley 4w/e 01/11/1952
87F Llanelly 4w/e 29/11/1952
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 08/08/1953
87F Llanelly 4w/e 31/10/1953
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 31/12/1955
86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 02/11/1957
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 30/11/1957
88E Abercynon 4w/e 19/05/1962
   Withdrawn on 27/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC OXY Oxley 4w/e 14/06/1947
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 19/05/1962
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5657
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
31/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
27/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5657    

prev prev