Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 918 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4284 Week
» 918 Month
» 337764 Year
» 1559329 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5656 m/e 02/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 02/1926
Withdrawal Fri 14/02/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 38 yrs , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1926
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 08/08/1959
87F Llanelly 4w/e 26/12/1959
87D Swansea East Dock 2w/e 17/11/1962
87E Landore 4w/e 28/12/1963
   Withdrawn on 14/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LDR Landore m/e 31/05/1948
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 08/08/1959
1STALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5656
Built at Swindon Works
   
08/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
26/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
14/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5656    

prev prev