Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 968 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4334 Week
» 968 Month
» 337814 Year
» 1559379 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5655 m/e 01/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1926
Withdrawal Thu 03/06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1926
18 Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 03/11/1945
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/08/1950
88D Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 17/05/1952
88D Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1952
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
   Withdrawn on 03/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AYN Abercynon 4w/e 03/11/1945
ALLOC RYR Radyr 4w/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
TOSTORE   5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 General Further locomotives noted carrying the prefix 'W' with blank tanks or tender sides were:-Nos. 33, 216/63, 393, 1141, 1993, 2048, 5388, 5625, 6703, 7751/68, while those lettered 'British Railways' were:-Nos. 361, 3103, 4217, 4533, 5035/99, 5257, 5520, 5641/52/55 an 6964. Nos. 271, 4206 an 5958 had been prefixed, but still carried 'G.W.R.' SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5655
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (18)    
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
03/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5655    

prev prev