Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1283 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14689 Week
» 67705 Month
» 187232 Year
» 3214085 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5655 |
29/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31229 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
29/09/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/10/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/09/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
01/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC, EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
23/09/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5655 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 255 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
07/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31229 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
08/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|
10/08/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31229 |
|
|