Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5631 |
07/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31207 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
07/07/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/07/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5631 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 231 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31207 |
|
|