Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 893 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14299 Week
» 67315 Month
» 186842 Year
» 3213695 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5618 |
26/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31194 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31427 |
24/10/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
26/05/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/05/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5618 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
05/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31194 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
24/10/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31427 |
|
|
01/02/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31427 |
|
|
08/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|